U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Myers et al v. Iowa Board of Regents
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
June, 2022
  • June 11, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 08, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 07, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • October 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 07, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2021: [Certify Class]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2020: [Certify Class]
  • November 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 20, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 09, 2020: [Stay]
  • July 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 17, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • June 15, 2020: [Leave]
  • June 09, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 19, 2020: [Stay]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 26, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 20, 2020: [Stay]
  • February 20, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 19, 2020: [Stay]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 12, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 11, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 30, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 25, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.