U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00343
  • Case Name: Roberts v. Schertz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 09, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 06, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.