U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Epstein Construction, Inc v. Modern Piping, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 07, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Strike]
  • January 25, 2022: [In Limine]
  • January 24, 2022: [Seal]
  • January 24, 2022: [In Limine]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Strike]
  • November 19, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • November 19, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 12, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • November 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • May 24, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 05, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 16, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Dismiss]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 28, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.