U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00345
  • Case Name: Charlton v. Freier et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 02, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 12, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [USCA Order]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 04, 2019: [Brief /Other]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 21, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 20, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • October 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.