U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Waste Commission of Scott County, Iowa v. AIG Specialty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2020: [Closing Documents]
August, 2020
  • August 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 09, 2020: [Closing Documents]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Sealed Document]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 10, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
  • December 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 25, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • November 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 07, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 29, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.