U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Engineered Seal Products Inc v. ASA Oil Seal Co, Ltd et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • June 22, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 25, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 02, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 04, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.