U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00352
  • Case Name: Hellems v. United States Department of Justice et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.