U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00355
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Menard, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • December 30, 2019: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 24, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 16, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 11, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 05, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.