U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00083
  • Case Name: Berner et al v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • November 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 23, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Status Report Order]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.