U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00357
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Quickflight, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 18, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • May 11, 2021: [Trial Brief]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 13, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 12, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 12, 2021: [Default Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 09, 2021: [Default Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 09, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 16, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 04, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.