U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00358
  • Case Name: Wright et al v. Secura Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • February 11, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Order]
  • December 06, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 06, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 03, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 05, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.