U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Garner et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 18, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 12, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • November 07, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 05, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.