U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04072
  • Case Name: Friesen et al v. Harvest International, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • December 10, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • November 20, 2019: [Remand]
  • November 15, 2019: [Change Venue]
  • November 05, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.