U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04064
  • Case Name: Nunes v. Lizza et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 14, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • November 01, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • October 17, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 07, 2022: [Compel]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
  • June 27, 2022: [Strike]
  • June 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Sealed Motion Access to Selected Parties]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 25, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Extension of Time]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • March 10, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 18, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 18, 2020: [Strike]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Stay]
  • January 21, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 21, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 21, 2020: [Strike]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.