U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00360
  • Case Name: McNeal et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • November 16, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 19, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 11, 2019: [Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 08, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 07, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.