U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Salazar v. U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.