U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00031
  • Case Name: TrueNorth Companies, LC et al v. TruNorth Warranty Plans of North America, LLC - Dft Eskridge dismissed with #40; see #55 Order when Final Judgment eneterd; Dft TruNorth Global dismissed with #314
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 11, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Motion with Access to Selected Parties]
  • June 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.