U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-mj-00167-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Watson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Detention]
  • November 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2019: [Bail/Bond Report (Sealed )]
  • November 13, 2019: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2019: [Detention]
  • November 13, 2019: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • November 13, 2019: [Appointing Public Defender or CJA Panel Attorney]
  • November 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 13, 2019: [Arrest]
  • November 13, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Complaint]
  • November 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.