U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00370
  • Case Name: Shorter v. Cleaning Connection, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 09, 2020: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 23, 2020: [Closing Documents]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 19, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • December 12, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 09, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 20, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 18, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.