U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00354
  • Case Name: Morris v. Larson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 02, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 02, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 12, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 06, 2020: [Reply]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • December 31, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 30, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.