U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03040
  • Case Name: Janson et al v. Raph Associates, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Stay]
  • July 01, 2020: [Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 06, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 10, 2019: [Dismiss]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 19, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.