U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00374
  • Case Name: Shepard v. Employers Mutual Casualty Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 17, 2020: [Transcript]
  • September 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 15, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • September 15, 2020: [Documents Sent]
  • September 14, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 10, 2020: [Transcript Request]
  • September 09, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
  • September 08, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 19, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 18, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • August 18, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 03, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 28, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 24, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 02, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 01, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 01, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 25, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Declaration]
  • June 19, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 19, 2020: [Compel]
  • June 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order]
  • June 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Declaration]
  • June 08, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 15, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2020: [Transcript]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [More Definite Statement]
  • March 20, 2020: [More Definite Statement]
  • March 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 16, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 04, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 07, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 07, 2020: [Seal]
  • February 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 05, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Attorney Forms]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 24, 2020: [Stay]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 25, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 21, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • November 20, 2019: [Seal]
  • November 20, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.