U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:18-cv-02056
  • Case Name: Hoffert v. Black Hawk County Jail et al - #39 Order dismissing dft State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 11, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 05, 2019: [Withdraw]
  • December 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 03, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.