U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00294
  • Case Name: City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund v. Meredith Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Documents Sent]
  • December 07, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
  • December 07, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 07, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 14, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 14, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 12, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 02, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 30, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 09, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 19, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 11, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 11, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 10, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 10, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 03, 2019: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.