U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00378
  • Case Name: Collier v. Boggs Properties, L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 20, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 30, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.