U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00377
  • Case Name: Karp v. Ritzman et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 24, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2020: [Reply]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Leave]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: [Remand to State Court]
  • December 10, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.