U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00089
  • Case Name: McManus v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • March 05, 2020: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • March 02, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 09, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.