U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00380
  • Case Name: Clawson v. Iowa Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 10, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 06, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • April 06, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 13, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 25, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 25, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.