U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00381
  • Case Name: Guzman Mendez v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 18, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 11, 2020: [Add Party]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Errata]
  • January 22, 2020: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • January 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 07, 2020: [Add Party]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 30, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • December 23, 2019: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 02, 2019: [Summons Issued]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 26, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.