U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00350
  • Case Name: Munguia Reyes v. United States Department of Justice
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2020: [Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 01, 2020: [Leave to File]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Leave]
  • March 24, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 27, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 04, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 27, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.