U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00385
  • Case Name: Darland v. Des Moines Area Community College et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order]
  • April 10, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 09, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 03, 2020: [Default Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • March 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
  • November 27, 2019: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.