U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00386
  • Case Name: Jaren Depenning et al v. The Iowa Clinic, P.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 25, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 24, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 24, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 21, 2020: [Remand]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • February 21, 2020: [Stay]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 14, 2020: [Stay]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 31, 2019: [Remand]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Remand to State Court]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 02, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.