U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00387
  • Case Name: Neppl v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • June 03, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 03, 2020: [Certify Objections of Law]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 19, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 28, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 23, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 22, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2020: [Certify Questions of Law]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order]
  • April 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • March 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2020: [Remand]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Reply]
  • January 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 03, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Remand]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 23, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 23, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 09, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • December 05, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • December 03, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 02, 2019: [Certificate]
  • December 02, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.