U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00388
  • Case Name: Wofford v. Schneider et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 04, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 21, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reconsideration]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • May 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 30, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • March 30, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2020: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • February 13, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Brief /Other]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 12, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • December 04, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • December 04, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 04, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.