U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00389
  • Case Name: Means v. Menard, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 10, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 03, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 03, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Order]
  • December 27, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 05, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 04, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.