U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00391
  • Case Name: Bela Animal Legal Defense et al v. City of Des Moines et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 10, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 09, 2021: [Stay]
  • September 08, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • September 08, 2021: [Stay]
  • September 08, 2021: [Remand]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Stay]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Joinder]
  • April 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 21, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • April 21, 2021: [Remand]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 13, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 13, 2020: [Joinder]
  • August 12, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Remand]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Joinder]
  • February 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 07, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • February 06, 2020: [Leave]
  • February 06, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • January 27, 2020: [Leave]
  • January 21, 2020: [Joinder]
  • January 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • January 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 06, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
  • January 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 10, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • December 09, 2019: [Joinder]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.