U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00032
  • Case Name: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. Salter
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • March 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 25, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • February 16, 2021: [Writ]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Declaration]
  • June 22, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 22, 2020: [Costs Taxed]
  • June 05, 2020: [Bill of Costs]
  • June 05, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2020: [Status Report]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 13, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 15, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 06, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 05, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.