U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00393
  • Case Name: Reasoner v. The Whittemore Co et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 30, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • November 18, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 18, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • November 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 29, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • October 07, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 07, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 02, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 02, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • October 01, 2020: [Brief /Other]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 24, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 13, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • July 13, 2020: [Leave]
  • July 13, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • July 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 30, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order]
  • January 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 09, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 06, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.