U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00340
  • Case Name: Cooks v. State of Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 09, 2020: [USCA Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [USCA Order]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 31, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 31, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 30, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 30, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2019: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.