U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Carlson v. Deere & Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 12, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 09, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.