U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00396
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Des Moines Area Regional Transit et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 21, 2020: [Protective Order]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 14, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 13, 2020: [Errata]
  • January 13, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • December 10, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 10, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.