U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00398
  • Case Name: Smothers v. Rowley Memorial Masonic Home et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 17, 2021: [Documents Sent]
  • September 14, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 08, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 10, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 10, 2021: [Certify Objections of Law]
  • August 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 22, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 22, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • July 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 15, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 14, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 01, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Certify Questions of Law]
  • July 01, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 01, 2021: [In Limine]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 19, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 10, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • March 01, 2021: [Reply]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 25, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 17, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 02, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 01, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • January 25, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • January 22, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 21, 2021: [Strike]
  • January 20, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 13, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 06, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 23, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 22, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 22, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 14, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • December 09, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 16, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 21, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • August 19, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • August 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 16, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 15, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 09, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Status Report Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 02, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 14, 2020: [Protective Order]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Errata]
  • March 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 27, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 27, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 11, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • December 10, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.