U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00383
  • Case Name: Klein v. Steinkamp
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 26, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 24, 2021: [Statement]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 04, 2021: [In Limine]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 21, 2021: [In Limine]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 25, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • January 21, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • January 20, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • January 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 20, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • January 04, 2021: [Brief /Other]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 30, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 30, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 30, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 30, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 30, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 13, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 12, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 09, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 09, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • November 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 05, 2020: [Compel]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 12, 2020: [Sealed Document]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 08, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • June 03, 2020: [Sealed Document]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • April 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Status Report]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 18, 2019: [Order]
  • December 18, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order]
  • December 11, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.