U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00399
  • Case Name: Day v. Aldi Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.