U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Carter v. Ludwick et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice - Other]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 07, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Documents Sent]
  • December 01, 2021: [Documents Sent]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 19, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • November 09, 2021: [Documents Sent]
  • November 09, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 05, 2021: [Subsequent Notice of Appeal]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 25, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 18, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2021: [Stay]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Errata]
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • July 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 26, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 01, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 11, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Errata]
  • July 30, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 30, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 30, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • July 30, 2020: [Leave]
  • July 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 09, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 11, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 11, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 13, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 30, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • March 30, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 30, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 20, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.