U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00403
  • Case Name: Diers v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 13, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 13, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Seal]
  • April 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order]
  • March 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 27, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.