U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02075
  • Case Name: Blake v. Mindshare Technologies, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Seal]
  • November 09, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Remand]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.