U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Telk v. Andrikopoulos et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • June 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 14, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Witness List]
  • May 11, 2020: [Notice - Other]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 16, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
  • April 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • February 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 12, 2020: [Leave]
  • February 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 06, 2020: [Jury Demand]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • December 13, 2019: [Errata]
  • December 13, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 13, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.