U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Dickinson v. First Midwest Bank
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 18, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 16, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.