U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00074
  • Case Name: McCabe v. Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
  • December 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 04, 2020: [Order]
  • November 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 29, 2020: [Compel]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • January 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 07, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 16, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.